Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/20/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/21/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 03/21/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/24/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/26/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/02/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/05/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/16/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/16/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/19/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/23/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/25/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/25/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/26/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/26/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/07/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/09/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/16/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/29/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/30/2003