Text: S.Con.Res.30 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Referred in House (03/31/2003)

 
[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Con. Res. 30 Referred in House (RFH)]

  1st Session
S. CON. RES. 30

                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             March 31, 2003

          Referred to the Committee on International Relations

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
 Expressing the sense of Congress to commend and express the gratitude 
   of the United States to the nations participating with the United 
                States in the Coalition to Disarm Iraq.

Whereas on September 12, 2002, the President of the United States, appearing at 
        the United Nations, called on that institution and its member states to 
        meet their responsibility to disarm Iraq;
Whereas on November 8, 2002, the United Nations Security Council approved 
        Security Council Resolution 1441 under chapter VII of the United Nations 
        Charter by a vote of 15-0, giving Iraq a final opportunity to comply 
        with its disarmament obligations;
Whereas on January 30, 2003, the Prime Ministers of Denmark, Hungary, Italy, 
        Poland, Portugal, and the United Kingdom, and the Presidents of the 
        Czech Republic and the Spanish Government, issued a declaration 
        regarding Security Council Resolution 1441, wherein they stated that 
        ``[t]he transatlantic relationship must not become a casualty of the 
        current Iraqi regime's persistent attempts to threaten world security . 
        . . . The Iraqi regime and its weapons of mass destruction represent a 
        clear threat to world security. This danger has been explicitly 
        recognized by the United Nations. All of us are bound by Security 
        Council Resolution 1441, which was adopted unanimously.'';
Whereas the January 30, 2003, declaration continued to state that ``Resolution 
        1441 is Saddam Hussein's last chance to disarm using peaceful means. The 
        opportunity to avoid greater confrontation rests with him . . . . Our 
        governments have a common responsibility to face this threat . . . . 
        [T]he Security Council must maintain its credibility by ensuring full 
        compliance with its resolutions. We cannot allow a dictator to 
        systematically violate those resolutions. If they are not complied with, 
        the Security Council will lose its credibility and world peace will 
        suffer as a result.'';
Whereas on February 5, 2003, the Foreign Ministers of Albania, Bulgaria, 
        Croatia, Estonia, Latvia, Lithuania, Macedonia, Romania, Slovakia, and 
        Slovenia issued a declaration regarding Security Council Resolution 
        1441, stating that ``the United States [has] presented compelling 
        evidence to the United Nations Security Council detailing Iraq's weapons 
        of mass destruction programs, its active efforts to deceive United 
        Nations inspectors, and its links to international terrorism . . . . The 
        transatlantic community, of which we are a part, must stand together to 
        face the threat posed by the nexus of terrorism and dictators with 
        weapons of mass destruction.'';
Whereas the February 5, 2003, declaration continued to state that ``it has now 
        become clear that Iraq is in material breach of United Nations Security 
        Council resolutions, including United Nations Resolution 1441...The 
        clear and present danger posed by Saddam Hussein's regime requires a 
        united response from the community of democracies. We call upon the 
        United Nations Security Council to take the necessary and appropriate 
        action in response to Iraq's continuing threat to international peace 
        and security.'';
Whereas many of the supporters of the January 30, 2003, and February 5, 2003, 
        declarations have provided important support to the United States in 
        addition to their political declarations; and
Whereas in addition to the supporters of the January 30, 2003, and February 5, 
        2003, declarations, important diplomatic and strategic support to the 
        United States-led Coalition to Disarm Iraq have been provided by such 
        nations as Afghanistan, Angola, Australia, Azerbaijan, Colombia, Costa 
        Rica, the Dominican Republic, El Salvador, Eritrea, Ethiopia, Georgia, 
        Honduras, Iceland, Japan, Kuwait, Macedonia, the Marshall Islands, 
        Micronesia, Mongolia, the Netherlands, Nicaragua, Palau, Panama, the 
        Philippines, Rwanda, Singapore, the Solomon Islands, South Korea, Tonga, 
        Turkey, Uganda, Ukraine, and Uzbekistan: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), 
That Congress--
            (1) commends and expresses the gratitude of the United 
        States to the nations participating in and contributing to the 
        Coalition to Disarm Iraq, including--
                    (A) the supporters of the January 30, 2003, 
                declaration issued by the Prime Ministers of Denmark, 
                Hungary, Italy, Poland, Portugal, and the United 
                Kingdom, and the Presidents of the Czech Republic and 
                the Spanish Government;
                    (B) the supporters of the February 5, 2003, 
                declaration issued by the Foreign Ministers of Albania, 
                Bulgaria, Croatia, Estonia, Latvia, Lithuania, 
                Macedonia, Romania, Slovakia, and Slovenia; and
                    (C) other allies of the United States who are 
                participating in or contributing to the Coalition;
            (2) expresses sincere gratitude to Australia, Denmark, 
        Poland, and the United Kingdom, whose military forces have 
        joined United States Armed Forces to disarm and liberate Iraq;
            (3) expresses sincere gratitude to the Prime Minister of 
        the United Kingdom, Tony Blair, the Prime Minister of 
        Australia, John Howard, and the President of the Spanish 
        Government, Jose Maria Aznar, for their courageous support and 
        strong commitment to the Coalition to Disarm Iraq;
            (4) expresses sincere gratitude to other allied nations, 
        including nations in the Persian Gulf region, for their 
        military support, logistical support, and other assistance in 
        the current campaign against the regime of Saddam Hussein in 
        Iraq;
            (5) welcomes and encourages the active involvement and 
        participation of these countries, other nations, and key 
        international organizations in the reconstruction and 
        administration of Iraq after the current conflict in Iraq; and
            (6) commends and expresses the gratitude of the United 
        States to the military personnel and civilians of the member 
        states of the Coalition to Disarm Iraq who are serving in 
        operations against the regime of Saddam Hussein in Iraq, and to 
        the family members of such personnel and civilians who have 
        borne the burden of sacrifice and separation from their loved 
        ones during the current conflict in Iraq.

            Passed the Senate March 27, 2003.

            Attest:

                                             EMILY J. REYNOLDS,

                                                             Secretary.