Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/07/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/01/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/14/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 07/15/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/29/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/29/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 11/04/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/21/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/21/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/21/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/21/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/08/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/08/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/08/2004