Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/30/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/11/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/24/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/24/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/25/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/25/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/25/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/25/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/25/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/25/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/26/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/26/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/26/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/07/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/08/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/14/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/14/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/14/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/14/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/15/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/15/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/15/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/15/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 07/15/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/16/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/16/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/16/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/16/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/16/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/16/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/16/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/16/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/16/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/16/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 07/16/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/16/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/16/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/16/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/17/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/17/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/17/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/17/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/17/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/17/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/17/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/17/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/17/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/21/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/21/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/21/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/21/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/21/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/21/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/21/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/21/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/21/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/21/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/21/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/22/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/22/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/22/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/22/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/22/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/22/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/22/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/23/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/23/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/23/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/23/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/24/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/30/2003