There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution directing Congress to enact legislation by October 2005 that provides access to comprehensive health care for all Americans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/30/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/30/2003Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5613-5614)
Action By: Senate
04/30/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5614)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/30/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/30/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/16/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/06/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/19/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/07/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/30/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.41. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/30/2003)

Directs Congress to enact legislation by October 2005 to guarantee that every person in the United States, regardless of income, age, or employment or health status, has access to health care that: (1) is affordable and that removes financial barriers to needed care; (2) is as cost efficient as possible; (3) provides comprehensive benefits; (4) promotes prevention and early intervention; (5) includes parity for mental health and other services; (6) eliminates disparities in access to quality health care; (7) addresses the needs of people with special health care needs and underserved populations in rural and urban areas; (8) promotes quality and better health outcomes; (9) addresses the need to have adequate numbers of qualified health care practitioners; (10) provides adequate and timely payments; (11) fosters a strong network of health care facilities; (12) ensures continuity of coverage and continuity of care; (13) maximizes consumer choice of health care providers and practitioners; and (14) is easy for patients, providers, and practitioners to use and reduces paperwork.