There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of Congress that Congress should participate in and support activities to provide decent homes for the people of the United States.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
06/17/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 1 (Roll no. 283).(text: CR H5424)
05/23/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7172)
05/23/2003Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7172)
05/06/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
06/17/2003-5:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/17/2003-5:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 1 (Roll no. 283). (text: CR H5424)
06/17/2003-5:06pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5444-5445)
06/17/2003-1:26pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/17/2003-12:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. Con. Res. 43.
06/17/2003-12:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5424-5431)
06/17/2003-12:40pmHouseMr. Miller, Gary moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
06/02/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
06/02/2003-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/02/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/23/2003SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7172)
05/23/2003SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7172)
05/06/2003SenateReferred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5789-5790)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/06/2003 Referred to
05/23/2003 Discharged from
House Financial Services06/02/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.Con.Res.43. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/17/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced in the Senate on May 6, 2003. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) everyone in the United States should have a decent home; (2) Members of the Senate and the House of Representatives should demonstrate the importance of volunteerism; (3) during the 108th and 109th sessions of Congress, Members, Habitat for Humanity, and contributing organizations, should sponsor and construct two homes in the Washington, D.C., metro area each as part of the "Congress Building America" program; (4) each "Congress Building America" house should be constructed primarily by Members, their families and staffs, and the staffs of sponsoring organizations working with local volunteers involving and symbolizing the partnership of the public, private, and nonprofit sectors of society; (5) each "Congress Building America" house should be constructed with the family that will own the home; (6) in the future, Members, their families, and their staff should participate in similar house building activities in their own States as part of National Homeownership Month; and (7) these occasions should be used to emphasize the importance of providing decent homes for all of the people in the United States.