Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/13/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/24/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/24/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/25/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 02/26/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/26/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 02/26/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/27/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/13/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/13/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/13/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/13/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/13/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/13/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/13/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/13/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/13/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/13/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/13/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/13/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/13/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/13/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/13/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/13/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/13/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/20/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/20/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/20/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/25/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/25/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/25/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/26/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/26/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/26/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/26/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/01/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/01/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/01/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/08/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/08/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/08/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/08/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/08/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/09/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/28/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/28/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/29/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/12/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/15/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/22/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/22/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/22/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/22/2003