There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A concurrent resolution expressing the sense of Congress that there should be established a National Visiting Nurse Association Week."

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution designating the second week in may each year as "National Visiting Nurse Association Week".


Actions Overview (4)

Date
11/19/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H10055)
10/10/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text as passed Senate: CR S11018)
10/10/2004Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/25/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
11/19/2004-7:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/19/2004-7:37pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10055)
11/19/2004-7:37pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10055)
11/19/2004-7:37pmHouseMr. Murphy asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
11/16/2004-7:49pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/16/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2004-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/10/2004SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text as passed Senate: CR S11018)
10/10/2004SenateS.Amdt.4052 Amendment SA 4052 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/10/2004SenateS.Amdt.4052 Amendment SA 4052 proposed by Senator Frist for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S11018; text: CR S11018) To amend the title.
10/10/2004SenateS.Amdt.4051 Amendment SA 4051 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/10/2004SenateS.Amdt.4051 Amendment SA 4051 proposed by Senator Frist for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S11018; text: CR S11018) To amend the preamble.
10/10/2004SenateS.Amdt.4050 Amendment SA 4050 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/10/2004SenateS.Amdt.4050 Amendment SA 4050 proposed by Senator Frist for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S11018; text: CR S11018) To propose a substitute.
10/10/2004SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S11017-11019)
10/10/2004SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/25/2003SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2712-2713)
02/25/2003SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2713)

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/25/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/27/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/06/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/10/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/19/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/10/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/11/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/12/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/23/2004
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/24/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/25/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 02/27/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/04/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/08/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/08/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/07/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/07/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/20/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/29/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/06/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/01/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/17/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/21/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/21/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/22/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/22/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/07/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/21/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/21/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/21/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/22/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/27/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/28/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/28/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/30/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/30/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/05/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/05/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/05/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/05/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/05/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/06/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/06/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/06/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/06/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/07/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/07/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 10/07/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/07/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 10/07/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/07/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/08/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/08/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/25/2003 Referred to
10/10/2004 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.8. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/19/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the second week in May each year as National Visiting Nurse Association Week.