Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 11/13/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/13/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 11/13/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/13/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 11/13/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 11/13/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 11/13/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 11/14/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/18/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/18/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/19/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 11/19/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 11/20/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 11/21/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/09/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/22/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 01/22/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/10/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/11/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/12/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/23/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/23/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/23/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/24/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/24/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 02/24/2004
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/24/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/25/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/25/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/25/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/26/2004
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/26/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/01/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/01/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/01/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/02/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/04/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/04/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/04/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/04/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/09/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/09/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/10/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/22/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/22/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/22/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/22/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/22/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/23/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/23/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/23/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/24/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/24/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/30/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/01/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/19/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/19/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/19/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/19/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/20/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/13/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/17/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/17/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/18/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/20/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/20/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/01/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/08/2004