There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution expressing the Sense of the Congress regarding negotiating, in the United States-Thailand Free Trade Agreement, access to the United States automobile industry.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/23/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
02/23/2004Referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1461)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/23/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/26/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/26/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/08/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/11/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/22/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/22/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/25/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/25/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/29/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/29/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/31/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/01/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/07/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/07/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/08/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/08/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/08/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 04/20/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/22/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/22/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/26/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/26/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/27/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/27/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/28/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/29/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/29/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/03/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/03/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/05/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/05/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/20/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/01/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/15/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/16/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/14/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/23/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Con.Res.90. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/23/2004)

Expresses the sense of Congress that negotiations on access to critical segments of the U.S. automobile market should not take place on a piecemeal basis, but only as part of: (1) negotiations that include all major automobile producing nations; and (2) comprehensive negotiations that address both tariff and nontariff barriers specific to the automobile industry, with progress on eliminating tariff barriers explicitly linked to concrete progress on eliminating nontariff barriers.