Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/23/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/26/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/26/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/08/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/11/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/22/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/22/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/25/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/25/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 03/29/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/29/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/31/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/01/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/07/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/07/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/08/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/08/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/08/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/20/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/22/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/22/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/26/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/26/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/27/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/27/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/28/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/29/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/29/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/03/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/03/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/05/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/05/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/20/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/01/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/15/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/16/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/14/2004