Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 11/25/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 12/09/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/09/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/12/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 02/23/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/26/2004
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/03/2004