There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution recognizing the 60th anniversary of the Allied landing at Normandy during World War II.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/15/2004Became Public Law No: 108-236. (TXT | PDF)
06/15/2004Signed by President.
06/03/2004Presented to President.
06/02/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 220).(text: CR 6/1/2004 H3553)
04/01/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S3595)
04/01/2004Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3595)
02/25/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
06/15/2004Became Public Law No: 108-236. (TXT | PDF)
06/15/2004Signed by President.
06/03/2004SenatePresented to President.
06/02/2004-6:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/02/2004-6:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 220). (text: CR 6/1/2004 H3553)
06/02/2004-6:03pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3682)
06/01/2004-3:11pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/01/2004-2:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S.J. Res. 28.
06/01/2004-2:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3553-3555)
06/01/2004-2:52pmHouseMr. Ryun (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
04/02/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
04/02/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/02/2004-9:01amHouseReceived in the House.
04/01/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3595)
04/01/2004SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3595)
02/25/2004SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1599)

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/26/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/27/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/27/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/01/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/01/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/01/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/03/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/03/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/04/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/04/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/04/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/04/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/04/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/08/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/08/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/08/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/08/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/08/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/09/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/11/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/11/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/11/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/11/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/11/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/12/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/12/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/22/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/22/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/22/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/22/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/25/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/01/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/01/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/22/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/04/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/18/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/25/2004 Referred to
04/01/2004 Discharged from
House Armed Services04/02/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.J.Res.28. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-236 (06/15/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes the 60th anniversary of the Allied landing at Normandy, France, during World War II on June 6, 1944.