Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/25/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/26/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/27/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/27/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/01/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/01/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/01/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/03/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/03/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/04/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/04/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/04/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/04/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/04/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/08/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/08/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/08/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/08/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/08/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/09/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/11/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/11/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/11/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/11/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/11/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/12/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/12/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/22/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/22/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/22/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/22/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/25/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/01/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/01/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/22/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/04/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/18/2004