Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/22/2004
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/22/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/22/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 03/22/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/22/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 03/22/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/22/2004
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/22/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/24/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/07/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/08/2004
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/08/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 04/08/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/03/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/14/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/16/2004