Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 04/21/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/21/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/26/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/26/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/28/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/28/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/29/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/29/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/29/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/04/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/05/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/16/2004