Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/29/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 04/29/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/03/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/03/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/03/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/03/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/04/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/04/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/04/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/05/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/05/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/05/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/05/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/10/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/10/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/10/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/10/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/11/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/18/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/19/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/01/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/08/2004