Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 05/06/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/06/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/18/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/15/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/16/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/30/2004