Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 01/16/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/16/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/16/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 01/23/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/29/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/29/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/05/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/05/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/05/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/05/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/19/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/19/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/19/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/19/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/20/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/26/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/05/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 05/19/2003