Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 07/07/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/07/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/13/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/14/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/19/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/19/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/21/2004