Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/11/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/11/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/11/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/17/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/20/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/20/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/25/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/25/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/25/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/25/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/09/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/10/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/10/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/10/2003