Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 05/06/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/06/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/13/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 05/13/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/13/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/14/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/19/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/19/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/20/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/20/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/21/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/21/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/21/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2003