Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/21/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/21/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/21/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/13/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/18/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/19/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/24/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/07/2003