There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution reaffirming support of the Convention on the Prevention and Punishment of the Crime of Genocide and anticipating the commemoration of the 15th anniversary of the enactment of the Genocide Convention Implementation Act of 1987 (the Proxmire Act) on November 4, 2003.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/10/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
06/10/2003Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7643)

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/10/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/11/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/12/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/12/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/12/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/12/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/12/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/17/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/19/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/19/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/24/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/24/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/14/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/28/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/28/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/28/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/13/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/22/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/05/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/28/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/04/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/07/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/16/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/10/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.Res.164.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.164. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/10/2003)

Reaffirms support for the Convention on the Prevention and Punishment of the Crime of Genocide.

Anticipates the commemoration of the 15th anniversary of the enactment of the Genocide Convention Implementation Act of 1987 on November 4, 2003.

Encourages the people and Government of the United States to rededicate themselves to ending genocide.