Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/09/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/25/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/25/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/25/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/31/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/01/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/19/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/22/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/27/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/05/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/19/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/19/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/17/2004