Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/22/2004
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/29/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/31/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/01/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/01/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/02/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/06/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/19/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/20/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/27/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/17/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/02/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/07/2004