Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/06/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/06/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/06/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/06/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/06/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/06/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/06/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/08/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/08/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/08/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 04/08/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/26/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/03/2004