Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/07/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/19/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/26/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/27/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/27/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/29/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/29/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/05/2004