Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/22/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/22/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/23/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/06/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/08/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/08/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/09/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/10/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/20/2004