Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 06/24/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/24/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/06/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/13/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 07/13/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/13/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/13/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/09/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/09/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/09/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/07/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/07/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/16/2004