Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 07/08/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/14/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/15/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/20/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/20/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/20/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/21/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/21/2004