There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution supporting the construction by Israel of a security fence to prevent Palestinian terrorist attacks, condemning the decision of the International Court of Justice on the legality of the security fence, and urging no further action by the United Nations to delay or prevent the construction of the security fence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/20/2004Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
07/20/2004Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8484-8485)

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/20/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/21/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/21/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/21/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/21/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/21/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/22/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/22/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/22/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/22/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/22/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/22/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/22/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/22/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/07/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/22/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/27/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/29/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/01/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/05/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 10/08/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations07/20/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.Res.408.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.408. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/20/2004)

States that the Senate recognizes Israel's right of self-defense against Palestinian terrorist attacks, and supports the construction of a security fence, the route of which, with the support of the Government of Israel, takes into account the need to minimize Palestinian land confiscation and the imposition of hardships on the Palestinian people.

Condemns the decision of the International Court of Justice on the legality of the security fence.

Urges the United States to vote against any further United Nations action that could delay or prevent the construction of the security fence and to engage in a diplomatic campaign to persuade other countries to do the same.