Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/20/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 07/20/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/21/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/21/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/21/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/21/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/21/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/22/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/22/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/22/2004
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/22/2004
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/22/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/22/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/22/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/22/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/07/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/07/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/22/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/27/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/29/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/01/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/05/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/08/2004