Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 09/09/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/14/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/14/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/14/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/20/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/20/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/20/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/20/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/21/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/21/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/21/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/21/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/21/2004
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/27/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/27/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/27/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/27/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/04/2004