Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/20/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 09/20/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/20/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/20/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/20/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/20/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/21/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/21/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/21/2004
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/21/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/21/2004
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/21/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/21/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/22/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/22/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/22/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/22/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/22/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/27/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/29/2004