Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/21/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/23/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/30/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/30/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/04/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/06/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/06/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/06/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/06/2004