Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/11/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/13/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/13/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/24/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/25/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/26/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/03/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/07/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/19/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/31/2003