Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/24/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/25/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/04/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/05/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/13/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/19/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/25/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/11/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/26/2003