There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2003, through September 30, 2003, October 1, 2003, through September 30, 2004, and October 1, 2004, through February 28, 2005.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/26/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/20/2003Star Print ordered on on the resolution.
02/27/2003Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/26/2003Submitted in the Senate. (consideration: CR S2835; text of measure as introduced: CR S2865-2871)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/26/2003

Committees (0)

As of 10/20/2020 text has not been received for S.Res.66 - A resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2003, through September 30, 2003, October 1, 2003, through September 30, 2004, and October 1, 2004, through February 28, 2005.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


No related bill information was received for S.Res.66.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Res.66. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/27/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced in the Senate on February 26, 2003. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees from March 1, 2003, through September 30, 2003, October 1, 2003, through September 30, 2004 , and October 1, 2004, through February 28, 2005: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Armed Services; (3) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (4) Budget; (5) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (6) Energy and Natural Resources; (7) Environment and Public Works; (8) Finance; (9) Foreign Relations; (10) Governmental Affairs; (11) Judiciary; (12) Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions; (13) Rules and Administration; (14) Small Business and Entrepreneurship; (15) Veterans' Affairs; (16) Aging; (17) Intelligence; and (18) Indian Affairs.

Provides that within the funds in the account "Expenses of Inquiries and Investigations" appropriated by the legislative branch appropriations Acts for FY 2003, 2004, and 2005, there is authorized to be established a special reserve to be available to any committee to meet specified unpaid obligations or expenses.