Committees: S.Res.66 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

No committee information was received for S.Res.66 - A resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2003, through September 30, 2003, October 1, 2003, through September 30, 2004, and October 1, 2004, through February 28, 2005.