Titles: S.Res.66 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2003, through September 30, 2003, October 1, 2003, through September 30, 2004, and October 1, 2004, through February 28, 2005.