Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/05/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/10/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/25/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/25/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/26/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/27/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/03/2003