Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/09/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/26/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/26/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/07/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/18/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/17/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/08/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/14/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/14/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/13/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/13/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/20/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/21/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2006