Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/01/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/01/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/05/2005