Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/10/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/10/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/24/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/12/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/27/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/27/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/13/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/13/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/31/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/25/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/15/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/11/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/17/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/29/2006