Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/01/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/01/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/12/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/10/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/12/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/12/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/12/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2006