Refine your search

9 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/06/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-303.
10/06/2006 Signed by President.
09/29/2006 Presented to President.
09/25/2006 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H6962-6963; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H6962)
07/19/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7934-7936; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S7934-7935; text as passed Senate: CR S7936)
07/13/2006 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Specter with an amendment. Without written report.
11/16/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10243-10245)
04/28/2005 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 109-64.
03/02/2005 Introduced in House