Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/27/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/13/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/13/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/20/2005