Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/03/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/24/2005