Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/10/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 11/16/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/18/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/18/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/18/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/07/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 12/07/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/13/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/14/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/14/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/15/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/15/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/01/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/14/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/16/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/28/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/01/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/02/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/07/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/07/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/07/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/07/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/07/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/08/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/08/2006